There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Orphan Product Extensions Now Accelerating Cures and Treatments Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to authorize a 6-month extension of certain exclusivity periods in the case of approved drugs that are subsequently approved for a new indication to prevent, diagnose, or treat a rare disease or condition, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/21/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
05/21/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/21/2015
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 06/09/2015
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 02/08/2016
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/12/2016
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 06/09/2016
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 06/20/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions05/21/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1421. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/21/2015)

Orphan Product Extensions Now Accelerating Cures and Treatments Act of 2015

Amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to require the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to extend by six months the exclusivity period for a drug or biological product approved by the Food and Drug Administration (FDA) when the product is additionally approved to prevent, diagnose, or treat a new indication that is a rare disease or condition (also known as an “orphan disease”).

Allows HHS to revoke an extension if the application submitted to the FDA for the new indication contained an untrue material statement.

Requires the sponsor of a product receiving an extension to notify HHS one year prior to discontinuing production for commercial reasons.

Requires HHS to notify the public of products that receive this extension and patents related to those products.

Limits a product to one extension under this Act. Sets forth that extensions under this Act are in addition to other extensions.

Applies only to products approved after enactment of this Act for a new indication that is a rare disease or condition.