There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1523. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-162 (05/20/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on April 26, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) This bill amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act) to revise the National Estuary Program by requiring the Environmental Protection Agency to make competitive awards to address urgent and challenging issues that threaten the economic and ecological well-being of coastal areas, including:

  • extensive seagrass habitat losses,
  • recurring harmful algae blooms,
  • unusual marine mammal mortalities,
  • invasive exotic species,
  • jellyfish proliferation limiting community access to water during peak tourism seasons,
  • flooding that may be related to sea level rise or wetland degradation or loss, and
  • low dissolved oxygen conditions in estuarine waters and related nutrient management.

(Sec. 2) The bill authorizes appropriations for FY2017-FY2021 for: (1) EPA administrative expenses relating to a grant or award, and (2) making grants and awards. The bill allocates funding for conservation and management plans for estuaries and for competitive awards.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
05/20/2016 Became Public Law No: 114-162. (TXT | PDF)
05/20/2016 Signed by President.
05/18/2016 Presented to President.
05/12/2016 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate bill by Unanimous Consent.(text as Senate agreed to House amendment: CR S2794)
04/26/2016 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1958)
10/29/2015 By Senator Inhofe from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 114-161.
08/05/2015 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S6349-6350)
08/05/2015 Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/08/2015 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
05/20/2016 Became Public Law No: 114-162. (TXT | PDF)
05/20/2016 Signed by President.
05/18/2016 Senate Presented to President.
05/13/2016 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
05/12/2016 Senate Senate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate bill by Unanimous Consent. (text as Senate agreed to House amendment: CR S2794)
04/27/2016 Senate Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
04/26/2016-4:04pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/26/2016-4:04pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1958)
04/26/2016-3:54pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1523.
04/26/2016-3:54pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1957-1959)
04/26/2016-3:54pm House Mr. Gibbs moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/29/2015 Senate By Senator Inhofe from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 114-161.
09/08/2015-6:35pm House Held at the desk.
09/08/2015-2:03pm House Received in the House.
08/06/2015 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
08/05/2015 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6349-6350)
08/05/2015 Senate S.Amdt.2639 Amendment SA 2639 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
08/05/2015 Senate S.Amdt.2639 Amendment SA 2639 proposed by Senator Whitehouse. (consideration: CR S6349; text: CR S6349)
08/05/2015 Senate Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6349-6350)
08/05/2015 Senate Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
08/05/2015 Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. Markup report CQ
Action By: Senate Environment and Public Works
06/08/2015 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Titles (1)

Official Titles:

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced:

A bill to amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to reauthorize the National Estuary Program, and for other purposes.


Subjects (13)

  • Aquatic ecology
  • Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
  • Executive agency funding and structure
  • Floods and storm protection
  • Lakes and rivers
  • Mammals
  • Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
  • Marine pollution
  • Pest management
  • Water quality
  • Wetlands
  • Wildlife conservation and habitat protection

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 06/08/2015
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 08/05/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works06/08/2015 Referred to
08/05/2015 Markup by
08/05/2015 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/24/2016 Legislative interest

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.