There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

DOTCOM Act of 2015
Domain Openness Through Continued Oversight Matters Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

DOTCOM Act of 2015
Domain Openness Through Continued Oversight Matters Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for certain requirements relating to the Internet Assigned Numbers Authority stewardship transition.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
10/27/2016Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune under authority of the order of the Senate of 09/29/2016 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
06/11/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
10/27/2016Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 657.
Action By: Senate
10/27/2016Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune under authority of the order of the Senate of 09/29/2016 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
06/25/2015Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/11/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 06/11/2015
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 06/11/2015
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 06/11/2015
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 06/16/2015
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/16/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation06/11/2015 Referred to
06/25/2015 Markup by
10/27/2016 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1551. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (10/27/2016)

Domain Openness Through Continued Oversight Matters Act of 2015 or the DOTCOM Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) This bill prohibits the Assistant Secretary of Commerce for Communications and Information from permitting the National Telecommunications and Information Administration's (NTIA's) role in the performance of the Internet Assigned Numbers Authority (IANA) functions to cease until 30 legislative days after the Assistant Secretary submits to Congress a report that contains: (1) the proposal relating to the transition of the NTIA's stewardship of the IANA functions that was developed in a process convened by the Internet Corporation for Assigned Names and Numbers (ICANN) at the request of the NTIA, and (2) the following required certifications by the Assistant Secretary.

The bill requires the Assistant Secretary to certify that: (1) such proposal supports and enhances the multistakeholder model of Internet governance, maintains the security, stability, and resiliency of the Internet domain name system, meets the needs of global customers and partners of the IANA services, maintains the openness of the Internet, and does not replace the role of the NTIA with a government-led or intergovernmental organization solution; and (2) the required changes to ICANN's bylaws contained in the final report of ICANN's Cross Community Working Group on Enhancing ICANN Accountability and the changes to ICANN's bylaws required by ICANN's IANA Stewardship Transition Coordination Group have been adopted.