There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Filipino Veterans of World War II Congressional Gold Medal Act of 2015

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Filipino Veterans of World War II Congressional Gold Medal Act of 2015

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Filipino Veterans of World War II Congressional Gold Medal Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Filipino Veterans of World War II Congressional Gold Medal Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to award a Congressional Gold Medal, collectively, to the Filipino veterans of World War II, in recognition of the dedicated service of the veterans during World War II.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/14/2016Became Public Law No: 114-265. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2016Signed by President.
12/07/2016Presented to President.
11/30/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text of measure as passed: CR H7020-7021)
07/13/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S5092-5094)
07/13/2016Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5092-5094)
06/11/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/14/2016Became Public Law No: 114-265. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2016Signed by President.
12/07/2016SenatePresented to President.
11/30/2016-5:28pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/30/2016-5:28pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H7020-7021)
11/30/2016-4:59pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1555.
11/30/2016-4:59pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7020-7024)
11/30/2016-4:59pmHouseMr. Huizenga (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/14/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/14/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/14/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/14/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/14/2016-10:06amHouseReceived in the House.
07/13/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5092-5094)
07/13/2016SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5092-5094)
06/11/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 06/11/2015
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 06/11/2015
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 06/11/2015
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 06/11/2015
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 06/15/2015
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 06/17/2015
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 07/14/2015
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 07/29/2015
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/10/2015
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/10/2015
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/22/2015
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/22/2015
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 09/24/2015
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/30/2015
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/05/2015
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/05/2015
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/06/2015
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 10/06/2015
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 10/06/2015
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/08/2015
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/21/2015
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 11/03/2015
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/03/2015
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 11/03/2015
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/03/2015
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/03/2015
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/16/2015
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 01/19/2016
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 01/19/2016
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 02/22/2016
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 02/24/2016
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 02/25/2016
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/29/2016
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 04/05/2016
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/05/2016
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/05/2016
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/05/2016
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/05/2016
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 04/05/2016
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 04/06/2016
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 04/11/2016
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 04/13/2016
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 04/14/2016
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 04/19/2016
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 04/19/2016
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 04/20/2016
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 04/20/2016
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/28/2016
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/09/2016
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/10/2016
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/19/2016
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/25/2016
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/25/2016
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/26/2016
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/08/2016
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/10/2016
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/14/2016
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 06/16/2016
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/16/2016
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/16/2016
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 06/16/2016
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/16/2016
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/20/2016
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/20/2016
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 06/21/2016
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/21/2016
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 06/21/2016
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/21/2016
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/22/2016
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/29/2016
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 06/29/2016

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs06/11/2015 Referred to
07/13/2016 Discharged from
House Financial Services07/14/2016 Referred to
Committee on House Administration07/14/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1555. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-265 (12/14/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate passed version is repeated here.)

Filipino Veterans of World War II Congressional Gold Medal Act of 2015

(Sec. 3) This bill defines "Filipino Veterans of World War II" to include an individual who served:

  • honorably at any time from July 26, 1941, to December 31, 1946;
  • in an active-duty status under the command of the U.S. Armed Forces in the Far East; and
  • within the Philippine Commonwealth Army, the Philippine Scouts, the Philippine Constabulary, Recognized Guerrilla units, the New Philippine Scouts, the First Filipino Infantry Regiment, the Second Filipino Infantry Battalion (Separate), or the First Reconnaissance Battalion; or
  • commanding or serving in such a unit as a U.S. military officer or enlisted soldier.

(Sec. 4) The President pro tempore of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Representatives shall make appropriate arrangements for the award of a single Congressional Gold Medal to the Filipino Veterans of World War II in recognition of their dedicated service during World War II.

The medal, following its award, shall be given to the Smithsonian Institution where it will be available for research and display.

It is the sense of Congress that the Smithsonian Institution should make the gold medal available for display elsewhere, particularly at other appropriate locations associated with the Filipino Veterans of World War II.