There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

East Rosebud Wild and Scenic Rivers Act

Short Titles as Introduced

East Rosebud Wild and Scenic Rivers Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate certain segments of East Rosebud Creek in Carbon County, Montana, as components of the Wild and Scenic Rivers System.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
08/30/2016Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/14/2016 with amendments. With written report No. 114-309.
06/15/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
08/30/2016Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 581.
Action By: Senate
08/30/2016Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/14/2016 with amendments. With written report No. 114-309.
07/13/2016Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
03/17/2016Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 114-496.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
06/15/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4140)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 06/15/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/15/2015 Referred to
07/13/2016 Markup by
08/30/2016 Reported by S. Rept. 114-309
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks03/17/2016 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1577. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (08/30/2016)

East Rosebud Wild and Scenic Rivers Act

(Sec. 3) This bill amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate specified river segments of the East Rosebud Creek in Montana as components of the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System.

Nothing in this bill creates a protective perimeter or buffer zone outside of the designated boundary of the designated river segments.