There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the Federal building located at 617 Walnut Street in Helena, Arkansas, as the "Jacob Trieber Federal Building, United States Post Office, and United States Court House".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/07/2015Became Public Law No: 114-67. (TXT | PDF)
10/07/2015Signed by President.
09/29/2015Presented to President.
09/24/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6197)
08/05/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S6363)
08/05/2015Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6363)
07/07/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
10/07/2015Became Public Law No: 114-67. (TXT | PDF)
10/07/2015Signed by President.
09/29/2015SenatePresented to President.
09/24/2015-1:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/24/2015-1:22pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6197)
09/24/2015-1:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1707.
09/24/2015-1:16pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6197-6198)
09/24/2015-1:16pmHouseMr. Crawford moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/08/2015-6:35pmHouseHeld at the desk.
09/08/2015-2:05pmHouseReceived in the House.
08/06/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/05/2015SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6363)
08/05/2015SenateSenate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6363)
08/05/2015SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/07/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4688; text of measure as introduced: CR S4688)

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 07/07/2015
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/30/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works07/07/2015 Referred to
08/05/2015 Markup by
08/05/2015 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/24/2016 Legislative interest

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1707. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-67 (10/07/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the federal building located at 617 Walnut Street in Helena, Arkansas, as the "Jacob Trieber Federal Building, United States Post Office, and United States Court House."