There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

RAISE Family Caregivers Act
Recognize, Assist, Include, Support, and Engage Family Caregivers Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

RAISE Family Caregivers Act
Recognize, Assist, Include, Support, and Engage Family Caregivers Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the establishment and maintenance of a National Family Caregiving Strategy, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/08/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8499-8500; text as passed Senate: CR S8499-8500)
12/01/2015Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/08/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber
12/09/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
12/09/2015-12:35pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/09/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/08/2015SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8499-8500; text as passed Senate: CR S8499-8500)
12/01/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 306.
12/01/2015SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
11/18/2015SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/08/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4843)

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions07/08/2015 Referred to
11/18/2015 Markup by
12/01/2015 Reported by
House Education and the Workforce12/09/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1719. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (12/08/2015)

Recognize, Assist, Include, Support, and Engage Family Caregivers Act of 2015 or the RAISE Family Caregivers Act

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to develop, maintain, and periodically update a National Family Caregiving Strategy.

(Sec. 4) HHS shall convene a Family Caregiving Advisory Council to advise it on recognizing and supporting family caregivers.

(Sec. 5) This Act shall terminate on December 31, 2025.