There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Early Participation in Regulations Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Early Participation in Regulations Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require agencies to publish an advance notice of proposed rule making for major rules.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/06/2016Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-343. Additional views filed.
07/21/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
09/06/2016Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 614.
Action By: Senate
09/06/2016Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-343. Additional views filed.
10/07/2015Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
09/16/2015Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held.
07/21/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 07/28/2015
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 09/28/2015
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 11/30/2015
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 02/22/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/21/2015 Referred to
09/16/2015 Hearings by
10/07/2015 Markup by
09/06/2016 Reported by S. Rept. 114-343

No related bill information was received for S.1820.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1820. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (09/06/2016)

Early Participation in Regulations Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) This bill defines a "major rule" as a rule that the Office of Information and Regulatory Affairs (OIRA) determines is likely to impose: (1) an annual effect on the economy of $100 million or more; (2) a major increase in costs or prices for consumers, individual industries, government agencies, or geographic regions; or (3) significant adverse effects on competition, employment, investment, productivity, innovation, or the ability of U.S. enterprises to compete with foreign-based enterprises.

The bill directs an agency, not later than 90 days before publishing a notice of proposed rule making for a major rule in the Federal Register, to publish advance notice of proposed rule making for such rule, which shall:

  • include a written statement identifying the nature and significance of the problem to be addressed, a general description of regulatory alternatives, the legal authority under which the rule is proposed, and an achievable objective for the rule and metrics by which the agency expects to measure progress toward that objective; and
  • solicit and provide a period of at least 60 days for submission of written data, views, and argument from interested persons.

Any deviation between policies set forth in such statement and any final agency action shall not be considered arbitrary, capricious, an abuse of discretion, or otherwise not in accordance with the Administrative Procedure Act.

The bill is inapplicable to a major rule:

  • for which the proposing agency is not required to publish a notice of proposed rule making,
  • if the OIRA determines that complying with the requirements described in this bill would not serve the public interest or would be unduly burdensome and duplicative of processes required by specific statutory requirements as rigorous as those prescribed in this bill, or
  • if the agency proposing the major rule is otherwise specifically exempted by law from notice and comment rule making procedures.

Such a determination made by the OIRA shall not be subject to judicial review.