There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

PACT Act
Preventing Animal Cruelty and Torture Act

Short Titles as Introduced

PACT Act
Preventing Animal Cruelty and Torture Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to revise section 48 of title 18, United States Code, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/10/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/10/2016Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/22/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/12/2016-4:49pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/12/2016-3:05pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/12/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/10/2016SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/10/2016SenateS.Amdt.5169 Amendment SA 5169 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/10/2016SenateS.Amdt.5169 Amendment SA 5169 proposed by Senator Boozman for Senator Toomey. (consideration: CR S7104; text: CR S7104) In the nature of a substitute.
12/10/2016SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7104)
12/10/2016SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/22/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 07/22/2015
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 08/05/2015
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 08/05/2015
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/10/2015
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/10/2015
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/15/2015
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/15/2015
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/16/2015
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/16/2015
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 09/16/2015
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 09/21/2015
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 09/21/2015
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/21/2015
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 09/22/2015
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 09/24/2015
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/29/2015
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 10/01/2015
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 10/01/2015
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 10/19/2015
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 10/19/2015
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/19/2015
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 10/20/2015
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 10/20/2015
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 10/26/2015
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/28/2015
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 11/03/2015
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/09/2015
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/30/2015
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 12/07/2015
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 12/15/2015
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/10/2016
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 02/23/2016
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/10/2016
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 06/29/2016
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/29/2016
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 11/17/2016
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 11/28/2016
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 12/06/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary07/22/2015 Referred to
12/10/2016 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1831. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (12/10/2016)

Preventing Animal Cruelty and Torture Act or the PACT Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the federal criminal code to revise and expand provisions with respect to animal crushing.

It retains existing criminal offenses that prohibit knowingly creating or distributing an animal crush video using interstate commerce. The bill also adds a new provision to criminalize an intentional act of animal crushing. A violator is subject to criminal penalties—a fine, a prison term of up to seven years, or both.

It provides additional exceptions for conduct, or a video of conduct, including conduct that is: (1) medical or scientific research, (2) necessary to protect the life or property of a person, (3) performed as part of euthanizing an animal, or (4) unintentional.