There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Defund Planned Parenthood Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for a moratorium on Federal funding to Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/22/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
07/22/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/23/2015
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/27/2015
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 07/28/2015
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/08/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions07/22/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1836. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/22/2015)

Defund Planned Parenthood Act of 2015

This bill prohibits, for a one-year period, the availability of federal funds for any purpose to Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., or any of its affiliates or clinics, unless they certify that the affiliates and clinics will not perform, and will not provide any funds to any other entity that performs, an abortion during such period.

The restriction will not apply in cases of rape or incest or where a physical condition endangers a woman's life unless an abortion is performed.

The Department of Health and Human Services and the Department of Agriculture must seek repayment of federal assistance received by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., or any affiliate or clinic, if it violates the terms of the certification required by this Act.