There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Advancing Hope Act of 2016

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Advancing Hope Act of 2016

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Advancing Hope Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Advancing Hope Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Advancing Hope Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to extend the pediatric priority review voucher program.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
09/30/2016Became Public Law No: 114-229. (TXT | PDF)
09/30/2016Signed by President.
09/29/2016Presented to President.
09/27/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H5945-5946)
09/27/2016Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
09/22/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
04/05/2016Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/28/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/30/2016Became Public Law No: 114-229. (TXT | PDF)
09/30/2016Signed by President.
09/29/2016SenatePresented to President.
09/27/2016-2:48pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/27/2016-2:48pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H5945-5946)
09/27/2016-2:47pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5945-5946)
09/27/2016HouseCommittee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
09/27/2016-2:47pmHouseMr. Walden asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
09/22/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
09/22/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/22/2016-5:57pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/22/2016SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/22/2016SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
09/22/2016SenateS.Amdt.5090 Amendment SA 5090 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/22/2016SenateS.Amdt.5090 Amendment SA 5090 proposed by Senator Coats for Senator Sanders. (consideration: CR S6063: text: CR S6063) To improve the bill.
09/22/2016SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6062-6064)
04/05/2016SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 415.
04/05/2016SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/09/2016SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/28/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 07/28/2015
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/08/2015
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 09/24/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions07/28/2015 Referred to
03/09/2016 Markup by
04/05/2016 Reported by
House Energy and Commerce09/22/2016 Referred to
09/27/2016 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1878. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-229 (09/30/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on September 22, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Advancing Hope Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to revise the priority review voucher program for rare pediatric disease medications. (A priority review voucher is a transferable voucher that entitles the holder to have a new drug or biological product application acted upon by the Food and Drug Administration (FDA) within six months.) The program is restricted to treatments for serious diseases and is terminated at the end of 2016.

Beginning 90 days after enactment of the bill, a medication sponsor who intends to request a voucher for a rare pediatric disease medication must notify the FDA of that intent upon submission of the application for the medication.

The bill applies to applications submitted to the FDA before enactment of the bill that have not been approved. Applications submitted before October 7, 2012, are not eligible for a voucher.

A voucher may not be issued for a rare pediatric disease product if a voucher was already issued for the medication under another program.

(Sec. 3) The Government Accountability Office must study the effectiveness of awarding priority review vouchers as an incentive for the development of medications for rare pediatric diseases that would not otherwise have been developed.