There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to prohibit Federal funding of Planned Parenthood Federation of America.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/28/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date
08/03/2015Motion by Senator McConnell to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure was not invoked (Record Vote No. 262) entered in Senate.
Action By: Senate
08/03/2015Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 46. Record Vote Number: 262. (consideration: CR S6227-6228; text: CR S6227)
Action By: Senate
08/03/2015Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S6215-6228)
Action By: Senate
07/30/2015Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (consideration CR S6161; text: CR S6161)
Action By: Senate
07/30/2015Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration CR S6161-6164, S6166-6180)
Action By: Senate
07/29/2015Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 169.
Action By: Senate
07/28/2015Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 07/28/2015
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 07/28/2015
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK]* 07/28/2015
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 07/28/2015
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 07/28/2015
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 07/28/2015
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 07/28/2015
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 07/28/2015
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 07/28/2015
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 07/28/2015
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 07/28/2015
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 07/28/2015
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 07/28/2015
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 07/28/2015
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE]* 07/28/2015
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 07/28/2015
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 07/28/2015
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 07/28/2015
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 07/28/2015
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 07/29/2015
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/29/2015
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 07/29/2015
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/29/2015
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 07/29/2015
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 07/29/2015
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 07/29/2015
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/29/2015
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/29/2015
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 07/29/2015
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/29/2015
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/29/2015
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 07/29/2015
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/30/2015
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 07/30/2015
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/30/2015
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 07/30/2015
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/30/2015
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 07/30/2015
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/30/2015
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/30/2015
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/30/2015
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 07/30/2015
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 07/30/2015
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/30/2015
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 08/03/2015

Committees (0)

As of 08/23/2019 text has not been received for S.1881 - A bill to prohibit Federal funding of Planned Parenthood Federation of America.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1881. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/28/2015)

This bill prohibits federal funding of Planned Parenthood Federation of America or its affiliates, subsidiaries, successors, or clinics.