Committees: S.1890 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary07/29/2015 Referred to
12/02/2015 Hearings by
01/28/2016 Markup by
01/28/2016 Reported by S. Rept. 114-220
House Judiciary04/11/2016 Referred to
04/20/2016 Markup by
04/26/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-529
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet04/11/2016 Referred to
04/18/2016 Discharged from