There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Mental Health Awareness and Improvement Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Mental Health Awareness and Improvement Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Mental Health Awareness and Improvement Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize and improve programs related to mental health and substance use disorders.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/18/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S8911-8913)
10/01/2015Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/29/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/08/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/05/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
01/04/2016-12:29pmHouseHeld at the desk.
01/04/2016-12:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/18/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/18/2015SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S8911-8913)
12/18/2015SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8911-8913; text of committee substitute as amended: CR S8908-8910)
12/18/2015SenateS.Amdt.2943 Amendment SA 2943 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/18/2015SenateS.Amdt.2942 Amendment SA 2942 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/18/2015SenateS.Amdt.2943 Amendment SA 2943 proposed by Senator Perdue for Senator Lee. (consideration: CR S8910; text: CR S8910) To provide for improved reporting.
12/18/2015SenateS.Amdt.2942 Amendment SA 2942 proposed by Senator Perdue for Senator Murkowski. (consideration: CR S8910; text: CR S8910) To increase amounts authorized to be appropriated for youth suicide early intervention and prevention strategies grants.
12/18/2015SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8908-8913)
10/01/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 247.
10/01/2015SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
09/30/2015SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/29/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Cosponsors (28)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions07/29/2015 Referred to
09/30/2015 Markup by
10/01/2015 Reported by
House Energy and Commerce01/05/2016 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/08/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1893. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (12/18/2015)

Mental Health Awareness and Improvement Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to expand the focus of a youth interagency research, training, and technical assistance resource center from youth suicides to suicide at any age, particularly among groups at high risk for suicide. The center is reauthorized through FY2020.

This bill revises and extends through FY2020 grant programs for: (1) the development of state or tribal youth suicide early intervention and prevention strategies, (2) enhancement of services for students with mental health or substance use disorders at institutions of higher education, and (3) training school personnel to recognize symptoms of childhood and adolescent mental disorders and safely de-escalate crisis situations involving individuals with a mental illness.

(Sec. 4) The grant program to address violence-related stress must support the continued operation of the National Child Traumatic Stress Initiative (NCTSI). The NCTSI coordinating center must report on child treatment and outcomes and facilitate training in evidence-based and trauma-informed treatments, interventions, and practices.

(Sec. 5) The Government Accountability Office (GAO) must report on federal requirements that impact access to treatment of mental health and substance use disorders.

(Sec. 6) The Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration (SAMHSA) may advance awareness of products approved by the Food and Drug Administration to treat opioid use disorders. (Opioids are drugs with effects similar to opium, such as certain pain medications.)

(Sec. 7) The GAO must report on children's access to mental health services and prescription of psychotropic medications to children.

(Sec. 8) SAMHSA must provide technical assistance to grantees regarding evidence-based practices for the prevention and treatment of geriatric mental health disorders and co-occurring mental health and substance use disorders, as well as disseminate information about such practices.

(Sec. 9) The Centers for Disease Control and Prevention is encouraged to improve the National Violent Death Reporting System.

(Sec. 10) The GAO must evaluate the utilization of mental health services for children and the implementation of recommendations made in "On Issues Raised by the Virginia Tech Tragedy."

(Sec. 11) The Office of the Assistant Secretary for Planning and Evaluation must evaluate the impact of SAMHSA activities and recommend performance metrics for SAMHSA programs. SAMHSA must advance the use of performance metrics to improve programs.