There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Commonsense Reporting Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to streamline the employer reporting process and strengthen the eligibility verification process for the premium assistance tax credit and cost-sharing subsidy.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
08/05/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
05/18/2016Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 114-675.
08/05/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 08/05/2015
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 09/10/2015
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 09/30/2015
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 10/06/2015
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/16/2015
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 04/27/2016
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 09/14/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance08/05/2015 Referred to
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship05/18/2016 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1996. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (08/05/2015)

Commonsense Reporting Act of 2015

This bill amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA) and the Internal Revenue Code to modify the requirements for employers to report health insurance coverage information to the Internal Revenue Service (IRS) by the end of the tax year.

The bill changes the information that is required and permits employers to voluntarily report the information prior to the beginning of open enrollment.

The Department of the Treasury must develop a prospective reporting system to permit:

  • employers to voluntarily report specified health insurance coverage information before the annual open enrollment period;
  • the exchanges, the Federal Marketplace Data Services Hub, and the IRS to access the information to provide the Department of Health and Human Services with information related to eligibility for advance payment of premium tax credits and cost-sharing subsidies;
  • the exchanges to communicate with employers and employees regarding eligibility for the tax credits or cost-sharing subsidies; and
  • employers to provide updates to the Federal Marketplace Data Services Hub regarding changes in coverage for employees.

At the time of enrollment, exchanges must provide employers the names of employees and dependents that enroll in a qualified health plan for a year.

If a health insurance issuer or employer is unable to obtain the Taxpayer Identification Number of a dependent, Treasury may permit the individual's full name and date of birth to be used instead.

Employers participating in the reporting system established by this bill are exempt from the requirement to report health insurance coverage information to the IRS by the end of the tax year.