There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Advancing Targeted Therapies for Rare Diseases Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Advancing Targeted Therapies for Rare Diseases Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to allow the sponsor of an application for the approval of a targeted drug to rely upon data and information with respect to such sponsor's previously approved targeted drugs.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
04/05/2016Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
09/15/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
04/05/2016Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 416.
Action By: Senate
04/05/2016Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
02/09/2016Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
09/15/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 09/15/2015
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 09/15/2015
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 09/15/2015
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 02/23/2016
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 04/20/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions09/15/2015 Referred to
02/09/2016 Markup by
04/05/2016 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2030. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (04/05/2016)

Advancing Targeted Therapies for Rare Diseases Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to permit the Food and Drug Administration to allow the sponsor of a new drug or biological product for the treatment of a rare, serious condition to rely upon information submitted for an approved medication that uses the same technology. For a sponsor to be eligible to rely upon submitted information: (1) the sponsor must have developed, or have a right of reference to, the relied upon information; and (2) the new medication must use nucleic acids (e.g., DNA) or similar chemicals, or must affect a disease-causing product of a mutated gene (e.g., the protein that causes cystic fibrosis).