There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Equity in Government Compensation Act of 2015

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Equity in Government Compensation Act of 2015

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Equity in Government Compensation Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Equity in Government Compensation Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to suspend the current compensation packages for the chief executive officers of Fannie Mae and Freddie Mac, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
11/25/2015Became Public Law No: 114-93. (TXT | PDF)
11/25/2015Signed by President.
11/19/2015Presented to President.
11/16/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8221-8222)
09/15/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6659; text as passed Senate: CR S6659)
09/15/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/25/2015Became Public Law No: 114-93. (TXT | PDF)
11/25/2015Signed by President.
11/19/2015SenatePresented to President.
11/16/2015-8:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/16/2015-8:11pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8221-8222)
11/16/2015-8:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2036.
11/16/2015-8:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8221-8223)
11/16/2015-8:01pmHouseMr. Hensarling moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/16/2015-8:09pmHouseHeld at the desk.
09/16/2015-2:19pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/16/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/15/2015SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6659; text as passed Senate: CR S6659)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 09/15/2015

Committees (0)

As of 01/15/2021 text has not been received for S.2036 - Equity in Government Compensation Act of 2015

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2036. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-93 (11/25/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate passed version is repeated here.)

Equity in Government Compensation Act of 2015

(Sec. 3) This bill requires the Director of the Federal Housing Finance Agency to suspend the compensation packages approved for 2015 for the chief executive officers of the Federal National Mortgage Association and the Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (government sponsored enterprises or GSEs), and any affiliates, and in lieu of such packages establish the compensation and benefits for each such chief executive officer at the same level in effect for that officer as of January 1, 2015. Such compensation and benefits may not thereafter be increased.

This suspension shall not be construed to affect the prohibition of the STOCK Act against receipt of bonuses by the chief executive officer of each GSE during any period of conservatorship. It shall only apply to such a chief executive officer if the GSE is in conservatorship or receivership as a critically undercapitalized regulated entity pursuant to the Federal Housing Enterprises Financial Safety and Soundness Act of 1992.

(Sec. 4) Any chief executive officer affected by this compensation package suspension shall not be considered a federal employee.