There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.2040. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-222 (09/28/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on May 17, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Justice Against Sponsors of Terrorism Act

(Sec. 3) This bill amends the federal judicial code to narrow the scope of foreign sovereign immunity (i.e., a foreign state's immunity from the jurisdiction of U.S. courts).

Specifically, it authorizes federal court jurisdiction over a civil claim against a foreign state for physical injury to a person or property or death that occurs inside the United States as a result of: (1) an act of international terrorism, and (2) a tort committed anywhere by an official, agent, or employee of a foreign state acting within the scope of employment.

International terrorism does not include an act of war. Federal court jurisdiction does not extend to a tort claim based on an omission or an act that is merely negligent.

A U.S. national may file a civil action against a foreign state for physical injury, death, or damage as a result of an act of international terrorism committed by a designated terrorist organization.

(Sec. 4) The bill amends the federal criminal code to impose civil liability on a person who conspires to commit or aids and abets (by knowingly providing substantial assistance) an act of international terrorism committed, planned, or authorized by a designated terrorist organization.

(Sec. 5) It establishes exclusive federal court jurisdiction over civil claims under this bill.

It authorizes the Department of Justice (DOJ) to intervene in civil proceedings to seek a stay. A court may grant the stay if the Department of State certifies that the United States is engaged in good-faith discussions with the foreign state to resolve the civil claims.

(Sec. 7) This bill's amendments apply to a civil claim: (1) pending on or commenced on or after enactment; and (2) arising out of an injury to a person, property, or business on or after September 11, 2001.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
09/28/2016 Became Public Law No: 114-222. (TXT | PDF)
09/28/2016 Passed House over veto: Two-thirds of the Members present having voted in the affirmative the bill is passed, the Passed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 348 - 77, 1 Present (Roll no. 564).
09/28/2016 Passed Senate over veto: Passed Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 1. Record Vote Number: 148.
09/23/2016 Vetoed by President.
09/12/2016 Presented to President.
09/09/2016 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
05/17/2016 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
02/03/2016 Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
09/16/2015 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (31)

Date Chamber
09/28/2016 Became Public Law No: 114-222. (TXT | PDF)
09/28/2016-3:02pm House The Chair directed the Clerk to notify the Senate of the action of the House.
09/28/2016 House Two-thirds of the Members present having voted in the affirmative the bill is passed, the Passed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 348 - 77, 1 Present (Roll no. 564).
09/28/2016-2:32pm House The previous question was ordered pursuant the previous order. (consideration: CR H6032)
09/28/2016-1:44pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on the question of passage of S. 2040, the objections of the President to the contrary, notwithstanding.
09/28/2016 House The Chair laid before the House the veto message from the President. (consideration: CR H6023-6032; text of veto message: CR 6023-6024)
09/28/2016 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
09/28/2016 Senate Passed Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 1. Record Vote Number: 148.
09/28/2016 Senate Veto Message considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S6166-6173)
09/26/2016 Senate Veto message ordered held at the desk.
09/23/2016 Vetoed by President. (text of veto message: CR 9/26/2016 S6071-6072)
09/23/2016 Senate Veto message received in Senate.
09/12/2016 Senate Presented to President.
09/09/2016-11:41am House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/09/2016-11:41am House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5239-5240)
09/09/2016-11:06am House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2040.
09/09/2016-11:06am House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5239-5244)
09/09/2016-11:06am House Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/07/2016-4:37pm House UNANIMOUS CONSENT - Mr. Sessions asked unanimous consent that it be in order at any time on the legislative day of September 9, 2016, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules, as though under clause 1 of rule 15, relating to S. 2040.
05/17/2016 House Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
05/17/2016 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
05/17/2016-4:50pm House Received in the House.
05/17/2016 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
05/17/2016 Senate S.Amdt.3945 Amendment SA 3945 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
05/17/2016 Senate S.Amdt.3945 Amendment SA 3945 proposed by Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S2847-2848; text: CR S2847-2848)
05/17/2016 Senate The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2847)
05/17/2016 Senate Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2845-2848; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S2846-2847)
02/03/2016 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 362.
02/03/2016 Senate Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Senate Judiciary
01/28/2016 Senate Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Senate Judiciary
09/16/2015 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6701-6702)

Titles (7)

Popular Titles:

JASTA bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles:

Short Titles as Enacted:

Justice Against Sponsors of Terrorism Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House:

Justice Against Sponsors of Terrorism Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate:

Justice Against Sponsors of Terrorism Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate:

Justice Against Sponsors of Terrorism Act

Short Titles as Introduced:

Justice Against Sponsors of Terrorism Act

Official Titles:

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced:

A bill to deter terrorism, provide justice for victims, and for other purposes.


Subjects (8)

  • Civil actions and liability
  • Crime victims
  • Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
  • Federal district courts
  • Government liability
  • Jurisdiction and venue
  • Terrorism

Cosponsors (25)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary09/16/2015 Referred to
01/28/2016 Markup by
02/03/2016 Reported by
House Judiciary05/17/2016 Referred to

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.