There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Directing Dollars to Disaster Relief Act of 2015

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Directing Dollars to Disaster Relief Act of 2015

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Directing Dollars to Disaster Relief Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Directing Dollars to Disaster Relief Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Directing Dollars to Disaster Relief Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to direct the Administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency to develop an integrated plan to reduce administrative costs under the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
02/29/2016Became Public Law No: 114-132. (TXT | PDF)
02/29/2016Signed by President.
02/25/2016Presented to President.
02/23/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H823)
02/09/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S756)
12/07/2015Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-173.
09/30/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/29/2016Became Public Law No: 114-132. (TXT | PDF)
02/29/2016Signed by President.
02/25/2016SenatePresented to President.
02/23/2016-4:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/23/2016-4:08pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H823)
02/23/2016-4:03pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2109.
02/23/2016-4:03pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H823-824)
02/23/2016-4:02pmHouseMr. Katko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/10/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
02/10/2016-12:20pmHouseReceived in the House.
02/10/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/09/2016SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S756)
02/09/2016SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text of committee substitute as amended: CR S755)
02/09/2016SenateS.Amdt.3296 Amendment SA 3296 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
02/09/2016SenateS.Amdt.3296 Amendment SA 3296 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Johnson. (consideration: CR S755; text: CR S755) To sunset the reporting requirement after 7 years.
02/09/2016SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S755-756)
12/07/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 313.
12/07/2015SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-173.
10/07/2015SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
09/30/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 12/09/2015
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 12/15/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/30/2015 Referred to
10/07/2015 Markup by
12/07/2015 Reported by S. Rept. 114-173
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/10/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2109.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.2109. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-132 (02/29/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on February 9, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Directing Dollars to Disaster Relief Act of 2015

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to:

  • develop and implement an integrated plan to control and reduce administrative costs incurred by FEMA in support of the delivery of assistance for major disasters;
  • compare the costs and benefits of tracking the administrative cost data for major disasters by the public assistance, individual assistance, hazard mitigation, and mission assignment programs;
  • track such information; and
  • clarify FEMA guidance and minimum documentation requirements for a direct administrative cost claimed by a grantee or subgrantee of a public assistance grant program authorized by the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act.

(Sec. 4) FEMA must submit to Congress, by November 30 of each year for seven years beginning on the date of this Act's enactment, and make publicly available on its website, a report on the development and implementation of the plan for the previous fiscal year, with three-year and five-year updates. Each report shall contain:

  • the total amount spent on administrative costs and the average annual percentage of administrative costs for the fiscal year period for which the report is being submitted;
  • an assessment of the effectiveness of the plan;
  • an analysis of whether FEMA is achieving its strategic goals for the average annual percentage of administrative costs of major disasters for each fiscal year and, in the case of it not achieving such goals, what is preventing it from doing so;
  • any actions FEMA has identified as useful in improving upon and reaching those goals; and
  • any administrative cost data for major disasters, if FEMA determines it is feasible to track such data.