There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Stop Sanctuary Policies and Protect Americans Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to hold sanctuary jurisdictions accountable for defying Federal law, to increase penalties for individuals who illegally reenter the United States after being removed, and to provide liability protection for State and local law enforcement who cooperate with Federal law enforcement and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/06/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
10/20/2015Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 280. (consideration: CR S7323; text: CR S7323)
Action By: Senate
10/20/2015Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S7314-7323, S7323-7332)
Action By: Senate
10/19/2015Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S7290-7302)
Action By: Senate
10/08/2015Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S7249; text: CR S7249)
Action By: Senate
10/08/2015Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S7249; text: CR S7249)
Action By: Senate
10/07/2015Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 252.
Action By: Senate
10/06/2015Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (16)


Committees (0)

As of 08/02/2021 text has not been received for S.2146 - Stop Sanctuary Policies and Protect Americans Act

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2146. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (10/06/2015)

Stop Sanctuary Policies and Protect Americans Act

This bill prohibits a sanctuary jurisdiction from receiving grants under the State Criminal Alien Assistance Program, the Community Oriented Policing Services Program, and the Community Development Block Grant Program. A sanctuary jurisdiction is a state or political subdivision that has a policy or practice in effect that: (1) prohibits or restricts information sharing about an individual's immigration status, or (2) prohibits compliance with a lawfully issued detainer request or notification of release request.

The Department of Justice (DOJ) must terminate grant funding 30 days after DOJ and the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) determine, notify, and publish the states and political subdivisions that are sanctuary jurisdictions.

A state or political subdivision that complies with a detainer is deemed to be an agent of DHS. The bill authorizes such agent to take actions to comply with the detainer. It also limits the liability of such agent if the actions taken complied with the detainer.

The bill amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to increase from two years to five years the maximum prison term for an alien who reenters after being denied admission, excluded, deported, or removed.

It establishes a 10-year maximum prison term for an alien who reenters after being denied admission, excluded, deported, or removed on 3 or more prior occasions.

It establishes a five-year mandatory minimum prison term for an alien who reenters after being removed following a conviction for an aggravated felony or following two or more prior convictions for illegal reentry.