There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Electrify Africa Act of 2015

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Electrify Africa Act of 2015

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Electrify Africa Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Electrify Africa Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Electrify Africa Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish a comprehensive United States Government policy to encourage the efforts of countries in sub-Saharan Africa to develop an appropriate mix of power solutions, including renewable energy, for more broadly distributed electricity access in order to support poverty reduction, promote development outcomes, and drive economic growth, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
02/08/2016Became Public Law No: 114-121. (TXT | PDF)
02/08/2016Signed by President.
02/03/2016Presented to President.
02/01/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H396-398)
12/18/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S8863-8865)
12/08/2015By Senator Corker from Committee on Foreign Relations filed written report. Report No. 114-176.
11/05/2015Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with amendments. Without written report.
10/07/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
02/08/2016Became Public Law No: 114-121. (TXT | PDF)
02/08/2016Signed by President.
02/03/2016SenatePresented to President.
02/01/2016-5:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/01/2016-5:22pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H396-398)
02/01/2016-5:05pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2152.
02/01/2016-5:05pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H396-400)
02/01/2016-5:05pmHouseMr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/18/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
12/18/2015-1:06pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/18/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/18/2015SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S8863-8865)
12/18/2015SenateS.Amdt.2939 Amendment SA 2939 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/18/2015SenateS.Amdt.2939 Amendment SA 2939 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Corker. (consideration: CR S8863; text: CR S8863) To improve the bill.
12/18/2015SenateThe committee amendments agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S8861-8863)
12/18/2015SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8861-8865)
12/08/2015SenateBy Senator Corker from Committee on Foreign Relations filed written report. Report No. 114-176.
11/05/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291.
11/05/2015SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with amendments. Without written report.
10/08/2015SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
10/07/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations10/07/2015 Referred to
10/08/2015 Markup by
11/05/2015 Reported by S. Rept. 114-176
House Foreign Affairs12/18/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.2152. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-121 (02/08/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on December 18, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Electrify Africa Act of 2015

(Sec. 3) This bill states that it is U.S. policy to partner with the governments of sub-Saharan African countries, international financial institutions, and African regional economic communities, cooperatives, and private sectors to:

  • promote first-time access to power services for at least 50 million people in sub-Saharan Africa by 2020;
  • encourage the installation of at least 20,000 additional megawatts of electrical power in sub-Saharan Africa by 2020;
  • promote reliable and affordable power in urban, rural, and under served areas;
  • encourage necessary reforms to support electricity access projects and market-based power generation and distribution;
  • promote policies to displace kerosene lighting with other technologies;
  • promote an energy development strategy for sub-Saharan Africa that includes the use of oil, natural gas, coal, hydroelectric, wind, solar, and geothermal power; and
  • promote the use of private financing and seek ways to remove barriers to private financing and assistance for projects, including through charitable organizations.

(Sec. 4) The President shall: (1) establish a multiyear strategy to assist countries in sub-Saharan Africa implement national power strategies and develop an appropriate mix of power solutions to provide access to reliable, affordable, and sustainable power in order to reduce poverty and drive economic growth and job creation; and (2) ensure that the strategy remains responsive to local community concerns and technological innovation.

The President may establish an interagency working group to coordinate the activities of U.S. government departments and agencies involved in carrying out the strategy.

(Sec. 5) The U.S. Agency for International Development, the Trade and Development Agency, the Overseas Private Investment Corporation, and the Millennium Challenge Corporation are urged to: (1) prioritize efforts and assistance for power projects and markets in sub-Saharan Africa; and (2) partner with other investors and local institutions, including private sector actors, to increase access to reliable, affordable, and sustainable power.

(Sec. 6) The President should use U.S. influence at international bodies to advocate for:

  • increasing investment in power sector and electrification projects in sub-Saharan Africa,
  • addressing energy needs of individuals and communities where electricity grid access is impractical or cost-prohibitive,
  • enhancing private sector coordination, and
  • assisting sub-Saharan African governments to remove unnecessary regulatory barriers to investment.

(Sec. 7) Within three years the President shall transmit a strategy progress report to Congress which includes information regarding: (1) U.S. programs supporting policy and legislative changes leading to increased power generation and access in sub-Saharan Africa, and (2) power projects receiving U.S. government support.