There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Black Hills National Cemetery Boundary Expansion Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Black Hills National Cemetery Boundary Expansion Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to transfer administrative jurisdiction over certain Bureau of Land Management land from the Secretary of the Interior to the Secretary of Veterans Affairs for inclusion in the Black Hills National Cemetery, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/06/2016Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment. With written report No. 114-325.
10/29/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
09/06/2016Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 598.
Action By: Senate
09/06/2016Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment. With written report No. 114-325.
07/13/2016Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
04/21/2016Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 114-500.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining
10/29/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 11/03/2015
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 01/19/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources10/29/2015 Referred to
07/13/2016 Markup by
09/06/2016 Reported by S. Rept. 114-325
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining04/21/2016 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2223. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (09/06/2016)

Black Hills National Cemetery Boundary Expansion Act

(Sec. 3) This bill transfers jurisdiction over approximately 200 acres of Bureau of Land Management land from the Department of the Interior to the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) for inclusion in the Black Hills National Cemetery, South Dakota.

The VA shall reimburse Interior for reasonable transfer costs, including survey costs.

The cemetery's boundary is modified to include such federal land.

For the period such land is under the administrative jurisdiction of the VA, it shall be withdrawn from all forms of appropriation under the public land laws, including the mining laws, the mineral leasing laws, and the geothermal leasing laws.