There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Muslim Brotherhood Terrorist Designation Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of State to submit a report to Congress on the designation of the Muslim Brotherhood as a foreign terrorist organization, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/03/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
11/03/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 12/02/2015
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 02/03/2016
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/10/2016
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/10/2016
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/10/2016
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 06/21/2016
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/06/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Foreign Relations11/03/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2230. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (11/03/2015)

Muslim Brotherhood Terrorist Designation Act of 2015

Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) the Muslim Brotherhood has met the criteria for designation as a foreign terrorist organization, and (2) the Department of State should so designate it.

Requires the State Department to report to Congress within 60 days whether the Muslim Brotherhood meets the criteria for foreign terrorist designation and, if not, which criteria have not been met.