There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Office of Strategic Services Congressional Gold Medal Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Office of Strategic Services Congressional Gold Medal Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Office of Strategic Services Congressional Gold Medal Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Office of Strategic Services Congressional Gold Medal Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to award the Congressional Gold Medal, collectively, to the members of the Office of Strategic Services (OSS) in recognition of their superior service and major contributions during World War II.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/14/2016 Became Public Law No: 114-269. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2016 Signed by President.
12/07/2016 Presented to President.
11/30/2016 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
02/22/2016 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S914-915)
02/22/2016 Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S914-915)
11/04/2015 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
12/14/2016 Became Public Law No: 114-269. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2016 Signed by President.
12/07/2016 Senate Presented to President.
11/30/2016-5:49pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/30/2016-5:48pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H7024-7025)
11/30/2016-5:28pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2234.
11/30/2016-5:28pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7024-7028)
11/30/2016-5:28pm House Mr. Huizenga (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/24/2016 House Referred to House Administration
02/24/2016 House Referred to House Financial Services
02/24/2016 House Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
02/23/2016-6:22pm House Held at the desk.
02/23/2016-2:11pm House Received in the House.
02/23/2016 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
02/22/2016 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S914-915)
02/22/2016 Senate Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S914-915)
11/04/2015 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 11/04/2015
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 11/04/2015
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 11/04/2015
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 11/04/2015
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 11/04/2015
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 11/04/2015
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 11/04/2015
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 11/04/2015
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 11/04/2015
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 11/04/2015
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK]* 11/04/2015
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 11/04/2015
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 11/04/2015
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 11/04/2015
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 11/17/2015
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/17/2015
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/18/2015
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 12/18/2015
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 12/18/2015
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 12/18/2015
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 12/18/2015
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 12/18/2015
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 12/18/2015
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 12/18/2015
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 12/18/2015
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 12/18/2015
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 12/18/2015
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/18/2015
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 12/18/2015
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 12/18/2015
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 12/18/2015
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 12/18/2015
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 12/18/2015
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 12/18/2015
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 12/18/2015
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 12/18/2015
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 12/18/2015
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 12/18/2015
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 12/18/2015
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 12/18/2015
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 12/18/2015
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 12/18/2015
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 12/18/2015
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 12/18/2015
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 12/18/2015
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 12/18/2015
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 12/18/2015
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 12/18/2015
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 12/18/2015
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 12/18/2015
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 12/18/2015
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 12/18/2015
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 12/18/2015
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 12/18/2015
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 12/18/2015
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 12/18/2015
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 12/18/2015
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 12/18/2015
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 12/18/2015
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/18/2015
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 12/18/2015
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 12/18/2015
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 12/18/2015
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 12/18/2015
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 12/18/2015
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 12/18/2015
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 12/18/2015
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 12/18/2015
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 12/18/2015
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 12/18/2015
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 12/18/2015
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 12/18/2015
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 12/18/2015

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs11/04/2015 Referred to
02/22/2016 Discharged from
House Financial Services02/24/2016 Referred to
House Administration02/24/2016 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (6)

  • Congressional tributes
  • Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
  • Military history
  • Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
  • Smithsonian Institution

Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2234. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-269 (12/14/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate passed version is repeated here.)

Office of Strategic Services Congressional Gold Medal Act

(Sec. 3) This bill requires the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to arrange for the presentation of a Congressional Gold Medal to the members of the Office of Strategic Services in recognition of their service and contributions during World War II.

After the medal is awarded, it must be given to the Smithsonian Institution.