There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Adoptee Citizenship Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for automatic acquisition of United States citizenship for certain internationally adopted individuals, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/10/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
11/10/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 11/10/2015
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 11/10/2015
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 12/03/2015
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 01/19/2016
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 06/13/2016
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/15/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary11/10/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2275. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (11/10/2015)

Adoptee Citizenship Act of 2015

This bill amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to grant automatic citizenship to all qualifying children adopted by a U.S. citizen parent, regardless of the date on which the adoption was finalized.

An individual born outside of the United States who was adopted by a U.S. citizen parent shall automatically become a U.S. citizen when the following conditions have been fulfilled:

  • the individual was adopted by a U.S. citizen before the individual reached age 18,
  • the individual was physically present in the United States in the citizen parent's legal custody pursuant to a lawful admission before the individual reached age 18,
  • the individual never acquired U.S. citizenship before the enactment of this Act, and
  • the individual was lawfully residing in the United States on the date of enactment of this Act.

An individual who meets such criteria, except for lawfully residing in the United States on the date of enactment of this Act, shall automatically become a U.S. citizen on the date on which the individual is physically present in the United States pursuant to a lawful admission.

A visa may not be issued to such an individual unless:

  • the individual was subjected to a criminal background check; and
  • the Department of Homeland Security and the Department of State coordinated with law enforcement agencies to ensure that appropriate action is taken regarding any unresolved criminal activity.