There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Duplication Elimination Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Duplication Elimination Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010 to create an expedited procedure to enact recommendations of the Government Accountability Office for consolidation and elimination to reduce duplication.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/09/2016Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
01/22/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
12/09/2016Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 719.
Action By: Senate
12/09/2016Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
02/10/2016Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
01/22/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 01/22/2015
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 03/09/2015
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 12/03/2015
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 05/23/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs01/22/2015 Referred to
02/10/2016 Markup by
12/09/2016 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.236. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (12/09/2016)

Duplication Elimination Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the President to send Congress a proposed joint resolution and a special message within 180 days of publication of the annual Government Accountability Office (GAO) report on duplicative government programs.

The joint resolution must: (1) address the recommendations contained in the GAO report and included by the President, (2) eliminate or consolidate programs identified in the GAO report as duplicative or fragmented, and (3) require savings from legislative changes to be transferred to the Treasury for deficit reduction.

Before the proposed joint resolution is transmitted to Congress, the President must consult with: (1) Congress to provide an opportunity for feedback, alternative recommendations, and input regarding which GAO report recommendations should not be addressed by the proposed joint resolution; and (2) the GAO.

The bill requires the special message to specify:

  • the GAO recommendations that are excluded from the proposed joint resolution,
  • why the recommendations were excluded,
  • the GAO recommendations included in the joint resolution, and
  • programs included in the GAO report that should be eliminated or consolidated.

The bill sets forth procedures and time periods for congressional introduction, expedited consideration, amendments, and points of order for the joint resolution.

The sponsor of the joint resolution must exclude, and it shall be out of order for the Senate or the House of Representatives to consider, provisions that: (1) are unnecessary to eliminate or consolidate programs in GAO-identified actions or areas of duplication, (2) are not germane to the GAO report, or (3) affect direct spending.

In the Senate, the joint resolution shall be agreed to only upon an affirmative three-fifths vote.

The bill provides procedures for the coordination of consideration between chambers and the consideration of presidential vetoes of such joint resolutions.