There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Titles: S.2390 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Federal Bureau of Investigation Whistleblower Protection Enhancement Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Bureau of Investigation Whistleblower Protection Enhancement Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide adequate protections for whistleblowers at the Federal Bureau of Investigation.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/25/2016By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 114-261.
04/14/2016Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
12/10/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
05/25/2016By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 114-261.
Action By: Senate
04/14/2016Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 421.
Action By: Senate
04/14/2016Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/14/2016Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
12/10/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S8605; text of measure as introduced: CR S8606-8607)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (11)

Cosponsors: S.2390 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 12/10/2015
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 02/29/2016
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/29/2016
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 02/29/2016
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 02/29/2016
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 02/29/2016
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/07/2016
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 03/07/2016
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 03/17/2016
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 04/14/2016
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 06/15/2016

Committees (1)

Committees: S.2390 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary12/10/2015 Referred to
04/14/2016 Markup by
04/14/2016 Reported by S. Rept. 114-261

Related Bills: S.2390 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

Summary: S.2390 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (04/14/2016)

Federal Bureau of Investigation Whistleblower Protection Enhancement Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill revises whistle-blower protections for a Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI) employee or job applicant who discloses wrongdoing to an appropriate official.

Specifically, it prohibits an FBI or Department of Justice (DOJ) employee from taking or failing to take a personnel action (e.g., demotion) with respect to an FBI employee or applicant because of a protected disclosure. A protected disclosure is a disclosure of information to an appropriate official which an employee or applicant reasonably believes evidences: (1) a violation of a law, rule, or regulation; or (2) waste, fraud, or abuse. The bill expands the list of appropriate officials who may receive a protected disclosure to include a supervisor in an employee's direct chain of command.

Additionally, the bill sets forth procedures for filing, investigating, adjudicating, and reviewing whistle-blower retaliation complaints.

An FBI employee or applicant may file a complaint with DOJ's Office of Inspector General (OIG), which must investigate and decide whether reasonable grounds exist to believe that a prohibited personnel action occurred.

If either party files an objection to the OIG's decision, then an administrative law judge (ALJ) must review it, on the record, and issue a written decision. The ALJ's determination becomes final, unless it is appealed to or reviewed by DOJ. Any ALJ or DOJ determination is subject to judicial review.