There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Tribal Veterans Health Care Enhancement Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Tribal Veterans Health Care Enhancement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Indian Health Care Improvement Act to allow the Indian Health Service to cover the cost of a copayment of an Indian or Alaska Native veteran receiving medical care or services from the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
11/16/2016Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. With written report No. 114-376.
12/17/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
11/16/2016Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 671.
Action By: Senate
11/16/2016Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. With written report No. 114-376.
06/08/2016Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/11/2016Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 114-537.
12/17/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 12/17/2015
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/16/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs12/17/2015 Referred to
05/11/2016 Hearings by
06/08/2016 Markup by
11/16/2016 Reported by S. Rept. 114-376

No related bill information was received for S.2417.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2417. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (11/16/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Tribal Veterans Health Care Enhancement Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Indian Health Care Improvement Act to allow the Indian Health Service (IHS) to pay copayments owed to the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) by Indian veterans for services authorized under the Purchased/Referred Care program.

The IHS and the VA, in consultation with impacted Indian tribes, must enter into a memorandum of understanding that authorizes the IHS to pay such copayments unless it would decrease the quality of, or access to, health care for individuals receiving care from the IHS or the VA.

The IHS and the VA must report on veterans who are IHS beneficiaries and have received care from the VA.