There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to prohibit the use of funds to make payments to Iran relating to the settlement of claims brought before the Iran-United States Claims Tribunal until Iran has paid certain compensatory damages awarded to United States persons by United States courts.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/20/2016Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
09/21/2016Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on National Security and International Trade and Finance. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 114-533.
Action By: Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on National Security and International Trade and Finance
01/20/2016Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 01/28/2016
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 02/01/2016
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 02/01/2016
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 02/04/2016
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 02/04/2016
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/01/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations01/20/2016 Referred to
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on National Security and International Trade and Finance09/21/2016 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2452. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/20/2016)

This bill prohibits the use of funds by the United States to make a payment to the government of Iran or an Iranian national relating to the settlement of any claim before the Iran-United States Claims Tribunal until the President certifies to Congress that Iran has paid all compensatory damages awarded to a U.S. person or entity in a final judgment of a federal or state court arising from an act of international terrorism for which the government of Iran was determined not to be immune from the court's jurisdiction.