There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Female Veteran Suicide Prevention Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Female Veteran Suicide Prevention Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Female Veteran Suicide Prevention Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Female Veteran Suicide Prevention Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to identify mental health care and suicide prevention programs and metrics that are effective in treating women veterans as part of the evaluation of such programs by the Secretary, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
06/30/2016Became Public Law No: 114-188. (TXT | PDF)
06/30/2016Signed by President.
06/23/2016Presented to President.
06/21/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H4006)
06/07/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S3597)
06/07/2016Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3597)
02/03/2016Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
06/30/2016Became Public Law No: 114-188. (TXT | PDF)
06/30/2016Signed by President.
06/23/2016SenatePresented to President.
06/21/2016-4:59pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/21/2016-4:59pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H4006)
06/21/2016-4:59pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4006)
06/21/2016-4:59pmHouseMr. Miller (FL) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
06/08/2016-12:37pmHouseHeld at the desk.
06/08/2016-10:04amHouseReceived in the House.
06/08/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/07/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3597)
06/07/2016SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3597)
05/24/2016SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 114-702.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/03/2016SenateReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs02/03/2016 Referred to
05/24/2016 Hearings by
06/07/2016 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2487. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-188 (06/30/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate passed version is repeated here.)

Female Veteran Suicide Prevention Act

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to identify: (1) VA mental health care and suicide prevention programs that are most effective for women veterans, and (2) such programs with the highest satisfaction rates among women veterans.