There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Adding Zika Virus to the FDA Priority Review Voucher Program Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Adding Zika Virus to the FDA Priority Review Voucher Program Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Adding Zika Virus to the FDA Priority Review Voucher Program Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Adding Zika Virus to the FDA Priority Review Voucher Program Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Adding Zika Virus to the FDA Priority Review Voucher Program Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to expand the tropical disease product priority review voucher program to encourage treatments for Zika virus.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
04/19/2016 Became Public Law No: 114-146. (TXT | PDF)
04/19/2016 Signed by President.
04/14/2016 Presented to President.
04/12/2016 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1602)
03/17/2016 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1606-1607; text as passed Senate: CR S1606)
03/15/2016 Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
02/08/2016 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
04/19/2016 Became Public Law No: 114-146. (TXT | PDF)
04/19/2016 Signed by President.
04/14/2016 Senate Presented to President.
04/12/2016-4:46pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/12/2016-4:46pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1602)
04/12/2016-4:33pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2512.
04/12/2016-4:33pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1602-1605)
04/12/2016-4:32pm House Mrs. Brooks (IN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/25/2016 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/21/2016 House Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
03/21/2016-2:15pm House Received in the House.
03/18/2016 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
03/17/2016 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1606-1607; text as passed Senate: CR S1606)
03/15/2016 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 389.
03/15/2016 Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
03/09/2016 Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
02/08/2016 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions02/08/2016 Referred to
03/09/2016 Markup by
03/15/2016 Reported by
House Energy and Commerce03/21/2016 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/25/2016 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (4)

  • Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
  • Drug therapy
  • Infectious and parasitic diseases

Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.2512. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-146 (04/19/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on March 15, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Adding Zika Virus to the FDA Priority Review Voucher Program Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to add Zika virus disease to the list of tropical diseases under the priority review voucher program, which awards a voucher to the sponsor of a new drug or biological product that is approved to prevent or treat a tropical disease. (A voucher entitles the holder to have a future new drug or biological product application acted upon by the Food and Drug Administration within six months.)

The bill makes a technical correction to the tropical disease list to refer to filovirus disease, a condition caused by the family of viruses that includes the Ebola virus, instead of the family of viruses.