There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Adam Walsh Reauthorization Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Adam Walsh Reauthorization Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Adam Walsh Reauthorization Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize certain programs established by the Adam Walsh Child Protection and Safety Act of 2006.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/23/2016 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 89 - 0. Record Vote Number: 83.(text: CR S3049-3050)
04/14/2016 Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/01/2016 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
06/01/2016 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: House Judiciary
05/24/2016 House Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
05/24/2016-1:15pm House Received in the House.
05/24/2016 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
05/23/2016 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 89 - 0. Record Vote Number: 83. (text: CR S3049-3050)
05/23/2016 Senate The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
05/23/2016 Senate S.Amdt.4078 Amendment SA 4078 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
05/23/2016 Senate S.Amdt.4078 Amendment SA 4078 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Grassley. (consideration: CR S3048; text CR S3048)
05/23/2016 Senate Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3043-3047, S3048-3050; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S3043-3044)
04/14/2016 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 422.
04/14/2016 Senate Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Senate Judiciary
04/14/2016 Senate Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Senate Judiciary
03/01/2016 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1138-1139)

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary03/01/2016 Referred to
04/14/2016 Markup by
04/14/2016 Reported by
House Judiciary05/24/2016 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations06/01/2016 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (17)

  • Assault and harassment offenses
  • Civil actions and liability
  • Congressional oversight
  • Crime victims
  • Crimes against children
  • Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
  • Criminal justice information and records
  • Department of Justice
  • Evidence and witnesses
  • Executive agency funding and structure
  • Genetics
  • Government information and archives
  • Human trafficking
  • Juvenile crime and gang violence
  • Law enforcement administration and funding
  • Sex offenses

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.2613. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (05/23/2016)

Adam Walsh Reauthorization Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Sex Offender Registration and Notification Act to reauthorize through FY2018 the Sex Offender Management Assistance program and the Jessica Lunsford Address Verification Grant program.

(Sec. 3) Additionally, it reauthorizes appropriations through FY2018 for the U.S. Marshals Service to locate and apprehend sex offenders who violate sex offender registration requirements.

(Sec. 4) The bill amends the federal criminal code to modify the duties of probation and pretrial services officers to include, when directed by a court, supervision of a sex offender conditionally released from civil commitment subject to court-ordered compliance with a prescribed regimen of medical, psychiatric, or psychological treatment.

(Sec. 5) It establishes statutory rights for sexual assault survivors, including the right to: (1) receive a forensic medical examination at no cost; (2) have a sexual assault evidence collection kit (i.e., a rape kit) preserved for 20 years or the maximum applicable statute of limitations, whichever is shorter; (3) receive written notification prior to destruction or disposal of a rape kit; and (4) be informed of the rights and policies under this section.

Additionally, it makes statutory crime victims' rights applicable to sexual assault survivors.

The term "sexual assault" means any nonconsensual sexual act prohibited by federal, state, or tribal law, including when a victim lacks capacity to consent.

Funds made available to the Crime Victims Fund under the Victims of Crime Act of 1984 must be used to carry out the requirements of this section, subject to specified exceptions.

(Sec. 6) The bill amends the Victims of Crime Act of 1984 to authorize DOJ's Office of Justice Programs to make grants to states to develop sexual assault survivors' rights and policies and to disseminate written notice of such rights and policies to medical centers, hospitals, forensic examiners, sexual assault service providers, law enforcement agencies, and other state entities.

(Sec. 7) DOJ must establish a working group to develop, coordinate, and disseminate best practices regarding the care and treatment of sexual assault survivors and the preservation of forensic evidence. The working group must report its findings and recommended actions.

(Sec. 8) It extends the statute of limitations for a minor victim of a federal sex offense to file a civil action to 10 years (currently 3 years) from the date such individual reaches age 18.