There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Federal Aviation Administration Reauthorization Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to Senate for portions of this bill
  • Pilot's Bill of Rights 2

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Aviation Administration Reauthorization Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Pilot's Bill of Rights 2

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 49, United States Code, to authorize appropriations for the Federal Aviation Administration for fiscal years 2016 through 2017, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/20/2016By Senator Thune from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-428. Additional views filed.
12/07/2016Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/09/2016Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
12/20/2016By Senator Thune from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-428. Additional views filed.
Action By: Senate
12/07/2016Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 715.
Action By: Senate
12/07/2016Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/16/2016Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/10/2016Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 114-635.
03/09/2016Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 03/09/2016
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 03/09/2016
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/09/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation03/09/2016 Referred to
03/16/2016 Markup by
12/07/2016 Reported by S. Rept. 114-428
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship03/10/2016 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (91)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2658. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (12/07/2016)

Federal Aviation Administration Reauthorization Act of 2016

This bill reauthorizes through FY2017 Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) operations and specified FAA programs.

The bill revises requirements for the airport improvement program and pilot program for passenger facility charges at nonhub airports.

The Government Accountability Office shall review privacy issues and concerns associated with the operation of unmanned aircraft (drones) in the national airspace system.

The National Institute of Standards and Technology and the FAA shall initiate a process to develop risk-based, consensus industry airworthiness standards for the safe integration of drones into the system.

The Department of Transportation (DOT) shall issue guidance for the operation of public drones.

The FAA shall carry out a pilot program for airspace hazard mitigation at airports and other critical infrastructure.

DOT shall issue a final rule authorizing the carriage of property by small drones for compensation or hire.

The FAA shall establish a Collegiate Training Initiative program for drones.

The bill requires the FAA to have a Senior Advisor for Unmanned Aircraft Systems Integration.

DOT shall establish a Safety Oversight and Certification Advisory Committee.

The FAA shall issue a final rule reorganizing the certification, and streamlining the approval of safety advancements, of small airplanes.

The FAA shall establish:

  • the FAA Task Force on Flight Standards Reform, and
  • a Regulatory Consistency Communications Board.

The FAA shall review and revise its safety workforce training strategy.

DOT shall take appropriate actions to promote U.S. aerospace standards, products, and services abroad.

The FAA shall:

  • take specified actions to improve airline passenger safety,
  • update automated weather observing systems, and
  • appoint a Designated Agency Safety and Health Officer.

Pilot's Bill of Rights 2

The bill directs the FAA to issue or revise medical certification regulations to ensure that an individual may operate as a pilot of certain small aircraft if the flight and the individual meet certain criteria.

The FAA may not take enforcement action against a pilot for not holding a valid third-class medical certificate unless the FAA has published final medical certification regulations in the Federal Register.

The bill amends the Pilot's Bill of Rights to authorize an individual adversely affected by an FAA decision to deny, suspend or revoke an airman certificate to file an appeal in the U.S. district court for a de novo hearing.

The bill establishes passenger air service improvements and consumer protections.

The bill amends the FAA Modernization and Reform Act of 2012 to extend through FY2017 DOT's Advisory Committee for Aviation Consumer Protection.

DOT may issue regulations to prohibit certain cell phone voice communications during the flight of an aircraft.

The bill reauthorizes through FY2017 the essential air service program and the small community air service development program.

The FAA shall conduct a return on investment assessment on each Next Generation Air Transportation System (NextGen) program.

The bill prescribes requirements regarding:

  • treatment of essential FAA employees during a furlough, and
  • maximum age limits for hiring of air traffic controllers.

The bill applies federal civil service requirements to leave used by disabled armed forces veterans in the FAA personnel management system.

The bill revises requirements for overflights of National Parks.

The FAA shall continue operation of the Advanced Materials Center of Excellence.