There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

EEOC Reform Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to ensure the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission allocates its resources appropriately by prioritizing complaints of discrimination before implementing the proposed revision of the employer information report EEO-1, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/16/2016Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
03/16/2016Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/17/2016
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/04/2016
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/05/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions03/16/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2693. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/16/2016)

EEOC Reform Act

This bill prohibits the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC) from implementing the proposed revision of the private sector employer information report EEO-1 published on February 1, 2016, until:
  • the EEOC collects annually from federal agencies the same employment data as a private sector employer with 100 or more employees would be required to collect under the revised report;
  • the EEOC develops software for processing and creates a comprehensive plan for using such information, including examples of how the EEOC will use the information in its enforcement efforts, protect the information from theft or public dissemination, and share the data with other agencies;
  • the Office of Management and Budget approves the EEOC's data collection procedures and comprehensive plan under a review process that provides for public notice and comments to evaluate the need for, and the burden of, the collection; and
  • the EEOC reduces its inventory of pending charges to not more than 3,660.

The EEOC must publish annual calculations of the cost of such data collection activities, including the number of employees and employee hours required to: (1) collect, verify, and protect the confidentiality of such data; and (2) be transferred away from duties that would reduce the number of pending charges of discrimination before the EEOC.

The Civil Rights Act of 1964 is amended to require the EEOC to approve or disapprove by majority vote a decision on whether the EEOC shall commence or intervene in litigation involving: (1) multiple plaintiffs, or (2) an allegation of systemic discrimination or a pattern or practice of discrimination. An EEOC member shall have the power to require the EEOC to approve or disapprove by majority vote a decision on whether the EEOC commences or intervenes in any litigation.

The EEOC must publish on its website information regarding each case brought in court by the EEOC after a judgment is made with respect to any cause of action. Such information must include: (1) instances in which the EEOC was ordered to pay fees and costs; (2) cases in which a sanction was imposed on the EEOC; (3) the total number of charges of an alleged unlawful employment practice or discrimination filed under specified civil rights, disability, employment, and labor laws; and (4) cases of systemic discrimination, including pattern or practice discrimination.

The EEOC is prohibited from bringing a suit unless it: (1) exhausts its obligation to use bona fide informal good faith endeavors of conciliation, and (2) certifies that conciliation is at impasse. The determination as to whether the EEOC has engaged in bona fide informal good faith endeavors is subject to judicial review.

The EEOC Inspector General must notify Congress of any sanctions, fees, or costs imposed on the EEOC by a court. The EEOC must report to Congress regarding the steps being taken to reduce such instances.