There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Fallen Heroes Flag Act of 2016

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Fallen Heroes Flag Act of 2016

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Fallen Heroes Flag Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Fallen Heroes Flag Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide Capitol-flown flags to the immediate family of firefighters, law enforcement officers, members of rescue squads or ambulance crews, and public safety officers who are killed in the line of duty.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
05/16/2016Became Public Law No: 114-156. (TXT | PDF)
05/16/2016Signed by President.
05/13/2016Presented to President.
05/10/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2164-2165)
04/19/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S2202)
04/19/2016Senate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2201-2202)
04/06/2016Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/16/2016Became Public Law No: 114-156. (TXT | PDF)
05/16/2016Signed by President.
05/13/2016SenatePresented to President.
05/10/2016-3:40pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/10/2016-3:40pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2164-2165)
05/10/2016-3:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2755.
05/10/2016-3:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2164-2166)
05/10/2016-3:31pmHouseMr. Nugent moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/20/2016-1:47pmHouseHeld at the desk.
04/20/2016-12:21pmHouseReceived in the House.
04/20/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/19/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2202)
04/19/2016SenateSenate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2201-2202)
04/06/2016SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Cosponsors (24)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Rules and Administration04/06/2016 Referred to
04/19/2016 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2755. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-156 (05/16/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate passed version is repeated here.)

Fallen Heroes Flag Act of 2016

(Sec. 3) This bill allows the Representative or Senator of an immediate family member of a deceased firefighter, law enforcement officer, member of a rescue squad or ambulance crew, or public safety officer who died in the line of duty to give the family, on request, a Capitol-flown flag, together with a certificate, signed by the official providing the flag (the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the Representative, or the President pro tempore of the Senate and the Senator), that contains an expression of sympathy for the family.