There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Stop Targeting of Political Beliefs by the IRS Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to prohibit the Internal Revenue Service from modifying the standard for determining whether an organization is operated exclusively for the promotion of social welfare for purposes of section 501(c)(4) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/28/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
01/28/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/28/2015
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 01/28/2015
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 01/28/2015
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 02/09/2015
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 02/24/2015
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 08/05/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Finance01/28/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.283. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/28/2015)

Stop Targeting of Political Beliefs by the IRS Act of 2015

Requires the Internal Revenue Service standards and definitions in effect on January 1, 2010, for determining whether an organization qualifies for tax-exempt status as an organization operated exclusively for social welfare to apply to such determinations after enactment of this Act. Prohibits the Secretary of the Treasury, or any delegate of the Secretary, from issuing, revising, or finalizing any regulation (including proposed regulations), revenue ruling, or other guidance not limited to a particular taxpayer relating to such standards and definitions. Terminates this Act after February 28, 2017.