There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Gullah/Geechee Cultural Heritage Act to extend the authorization for the Gullah/Geechee Cultural Heritage Corridor Commission.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/06/2016Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 114-331.
04/21/2016Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
09/06/2016Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 604.
Action By: Senate
09/06/2016Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 114-331.
07/13/2016Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/15/2016Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
04/21/2016Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources04/21/2016 Referred to
07/13/2016 Markup by
09/06/2016 Reported by S. Rept. 114-331
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks06/15/2016 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2839. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (09/06/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

(Sec. 1) This bill amends the Gullah/Geechee Cultural Heritage Act to extend the authorization for the Gullah/Geechee Cultural Heritage Corridor Commission through October 12, 2021.