There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Global Magnitsky Human Rights Accountability Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Global Magnitsky Human Rights Accountability Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Global Magnitsky Human Rights Accountability Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to impose sanctions with respect to foreign persons responsible for gross violations of internationally recognized human rights, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/17/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/29/2015Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment. Without written report.
01/28/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/18/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/18/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
04/18/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/18/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/18/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
12/18/2015-3:31pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/18/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/18/2015-10:00amHouseReceived in the House.
12/17/2015SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/17/2015SenateS.Amdt.2937 Amendment SA 2937 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/17/2015SenateS.Amdt.2937 Amendment SA 2937 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Cardin. (consideration: CR S8836) In the nature of a substitute.
12/17/2015SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8836)
12/17/2015SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8835-8836; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S8835-8836)
07/29/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 174.
07/29/2015SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment. Without written report.
07/29/2015SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
01/28/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (10)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations01/28/2015 Referred to
07/29/2015 Markup by
07/29/2015 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs04/18/2016 Referred to
05/18/2016 Markup by
House Judiciary04/18/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.284. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (12/17/2015)

Global Magnitsky Human Rights Accountability Act

(Sec. 3) This bill authorizes the President to impose U.S. entry and property sanctions against any foreign person (or entity) who:

  • is responsible for extrajudicial killings, torture, or other gross violations of internationally recognized human rights committed against individuals in any foreign country seeking to expose illegal activity carried out by government officials, or to obtain, exercise, or promote human rights and freedoms;
  • acted as an agent of or on behalf of a foreign person in such activities;
  • is a government official or senior associate of such official responsible for, or complicit in, ordering or otherwise directing acts of significant corruption, including the expropriation of private or public assets for personal gain, corruption related to government contracts or the extraction of natural resources, bribery, or the facilitation or transfer of the proceeds of corruption to foreign jurisdictions; or
  • has materially assisted or provided financial, material, or technological support for, or goods or services in support of, such activities.

The authority to block and prohibit transactions in property and property interests shall not include the authority to impose sanctions on the importation of goods (any article, natural or man made substance, material, supply or manufactured product, including inspection and test equipment, excluding technical data).

The President shall, after receiving a request from the chairperson and ranking member of one of the appropriate congressional committees with respect to whether a foreign person has engaged in a prohibited activity:

  • determine if the person has engaged in such an activity; and
  • report to the chairperson and ranking member whether or not the President imposed or intends to impose specified sanctions against the person.

Sanctions shall not apply to an individual as necessary for law enforcement purposes, or to comply with the Agreement between the United Nations (U.N.) and the United States regarding the U.N. Headquarters or other applicable international obligations of the United States.

The President may terminate sanctions under specified conditions.

The Assistant Secretary of State for Democracy, Human Rights, and Labor may submit to the Department of State the names of foreign persons who may meet the sanctions criteria.

(Sec. 4) The President shall report to Congress annually regarding each foreign person sanctioned, the type of sanctions imposed, and the reason for their imposition.