There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Venezuela Defense of Human Rights and Civil Society Extension Act of 2016

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Venezuela Defense of Human Rights and Civil Society Extension Act of 2016

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Venezuela Defense of Human Rights and Civil Society Extension Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Venezuela Defense of Human Rights and Civil Society Extension Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Venezuela Defense of Human Rights and Civil Society Extension Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to extend the termination of sanctions with respect to Venezuela under the Venezuela Defense of Human Rights and Civil Society Act of 2014.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
07/15/2016Became Public Law No: 114-194. (TXT | PDF)
07/15/2016Signed by President.
07/08/2016Presented to President.
07/06/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H4334)
07/06/2016Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
07/06/2016Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
04/28/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2577; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S2577; text as passed Senate: CR S2577)
04/28/2016Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment. Without written report.
04/25/2016Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
07/15/2016Became Public Law No: 114-194. (TXT | PDF)
07/15/2016Signed by President.
07/08/2016SenatePresented to President.
07/06/2016-4:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/06/2016-4:18pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H4334)
07/06/2016-4:18pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4334)
07/06/2016HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
07/06/2016HouseCommittee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
07/06/2016-4:18pmHouseMs. Ros-Lehtinen asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
04/29/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/29/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/29/2016HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/29/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/29/2016-12:10pmHouseReceived in the House.
04/28/2016SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2577; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S2577; text as passed Senate: CR S2577)
04/28/2016SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 445.
04/28/2016SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment. Without written report.
04/28/2016SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
04/25/2016SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 04/25/2016
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 04/27/2016

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations04/25/2016 Referred to
04/28/2016 Markup by
04/28/2016 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs04/29/2016 Referred to
07/06/2016 Discharged from
House Judiciary04/29/2016 Referred to
07/06/2016 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2845. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-194 (07/15/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on April 28, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Venezuela Defense of Human Rights and Civil Society Extension Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Venezuela Defense of Human Rights and Civil Society Act of 2014 to extend through December 31, 2019, provisions requiring the President to impose sanctions against individuals in Venezuela who are responsible for human rights violations.