There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Prove It Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Prove It Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require greater transparency for Federal regulatory decisions that impact small businesses.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/20/2016By Senator Vitter from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-420. Minority views filed.
05/24/2016Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Vitter without amendment. Without written report.
04/25/2016Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date
12/20/2016By Senator Vitter from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-420. Minority views filed.
Action By: Senate
05/24/2016Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 484.
Action By: Senate
05/24/2016Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Vitter without amendment. Without written report.
05/11/2016Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
04/27/2016Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 114-637.
04/25/2016Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship04/25/2016 Referred to
04/27/2016 Hearings by
05/11/2016 Markup by
05/24/2016 Reported by S. Rept. 114-420

No related bill information was received for S.2847.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2847. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (05/24/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Prove It Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the Chief Counsel of the Small Business Administration (SBA) to request the Office of Information and Regulatory Affairs of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) to review any federal agency certification that a proposed rule, if promulgated, will not have a significant economic impact on a substantial number of small entities and so need not submit a regulatory flexibility analysis of the rule.

The request for a review must:

  • be published in the Federal Register and on the website of the SBA Office of Advocacy,
  • include any documentation or comments the Chief Counsel furnished or made during the notice and comment period for the proposed rule, and
  • explain why the Chief Counsel disagreed with the certification and statement providing the factual basis for it.

Within 10 days after the request for review is published in the Federal Register, the federal agency in question shall submit to the SBA a response to the request and publish it in the Federal Register and on the agency website.

If it is determined, after a specified procedure, that the proposed rule will, if promulgated, have a significant economic impact on a substantial number of small entities, the federal agency shall then perform both an initial and a final regulatory flexibility analysis for the rule.