There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Emmett Till Unsolved Civil Rights Crimes Reauthorization Act of 2016

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Emmett Till Unsolved Civil Rights Crimes Reauthorization Act of 2016

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Emmett Till Unsolved Civil Rights Crimes Reauthorization Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Emmett Till Unsolved Civil Rights Crimes Reauthorization Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize the Emmett Till Unsolved Civil Rights Crime Act of 2007.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/16/2016Became Public Law No: 114-325. (TXT | PDF)
12/16/2016Signed by President.
12/14/2016Presented to President.
12/10/2016Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 2854 by Voice Vote.
12/07/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7343)
07/14/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
07/14/2016Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/26/2016Introduced in Senate

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber
12/16/2016Became Public Law No: 114-325. (TXT | PDF)
12/16/2016Signed by President.
12/14/2016SenatePresented to President.
12/12/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/10/2016SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment to S. 2854 by Voice Vote.
12/10/2016SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7135)
12/08/2016SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
12/07/2016-7:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/07/2016-7:11pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7343)
12/07/2016-6:57pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2854.
12/07/2016-6:57pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7343-7346)
12/07/2016-6:57pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/27/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/27/2016HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/18/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
07/18/2016-2:35pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/15/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/14/2016SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
07/14/2016SenateS.Amdt.4975 Amendment SA 4975 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
07/14/2016SenateS.Amdt.4975 Amendment SA 4975 proposed by Senator Murkowski for Senator Burr. (consideration: CR S5184-5185; text: CR S5184-5185) In the nature of a substitute.
07/14/2016SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5183-5185)
07/14/2016SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/26/2016SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary04/26/2016 Referred to
07/14/2016 Discharged from
House Judiciary07/18/2016 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations07/27/2016 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice07/27/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2854. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-325 (12/16/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on December 7, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Emmett Till Unsolved Civil Rights Crimes Reauthorization Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill reauthorizes the Emmett Till Unsolved Civil Rights Crime Act of 2007 (Emmett Till Act) and expands the responsibilities of the Department of Justice (DOJ) and the Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI) to include the investigation and prosecution of criminal civil rights statutes violations that occurred before 1980 and resulted in a death. (Currently, Emmett Till Act investigations are limited to violations that occurred before 1970.)

The bill expresses the sense of Congress that all authorities with jurisdiction should: (1) meet regularly with civil rights organizations, institutions of higher education, and DOJ-designated entities to coordinate information sharing and discuss the status of DOJ's Emmett Till Act work; (2) support the full accounting of all victims whose deaths or disappearances were the result of racially motivated crimes; (3) hold accountable under federal and state law individuals who were perpetrators of, or accomplices in, unsolved civil rights murders and disappearances; (4) keep families regularly informed about the status of the investigations; and (5) expeditiously comply with Freedom of Information Act requests and develop a singular, publicly accessible repository of these disclosed documents.

In investigating a complaint, DOJ may coordinate activities with entities that DOJ determines to be appropriate.

DOJ may reopen and review cases closed without an in-person investigation conducted by DOJ or the FBI.

DOJ must hold meetings with the Civil Rights Division, the FBI, the Community Relations Service, civil rights organizations, institutions of higher education, DOJ-designated entities, and state and local law enforcement to discuss the status of its Emmett Till Act work.

In an annual report to Congress, DOJ must indicate:

  • the number of cases referred by a civil rights organization, an institution of higher education, or a state or local law enforcement agency;
  • the number of such cases that resulted in federal charges;
  • the date any such charges were filed;
  • whether DOJ has declined to prosecute or participate in an investigation of a referred case;
  • the outreach, collaboration, and support for investigations and prosecutions of violations of criminal civil rights statutes, including murders and disappearances; and
  • any activity on reopened cases.

The Community Relations Service must provide technical assistance by bringing together law enforcement agencies and communities to address tensions raised by civil rights era crimes.