There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (9)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

ECHO Act
Expanding Capacity for Health Outcomes Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

ECHO Act
Expanding Capacity for Health Outcomes Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

ECHO Act
Expanding Capacity for Health Outcomes Act

Short Titles as Introduced

ECHO Act
Expanding Capacity for Health Outcomes Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require studies and reports examining the use of, and opportunities to use, technology-enabled collaborative learning and capacity building models to improve programs of the Department of Health and Human Services, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/14/2016Became Public Law No: 114-270. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2016Signed by President.
12/08/2016Presented to President.
12/06/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7198)
11/29/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 0. Record Vote Number: 154.
11/29/2016Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/28/2016Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/14/2016Became Public Law No: 114-270. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2016Signed by President.
12/08/2016SenatePresented to President.
12/06/2016-1:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/06/2016-1:03pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7198)
12/06/2016-12:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2873.
12/06/2016-12:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7198-7199)
12/06/2016-12:55pmHouseMr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/29/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
11/29/2016-3:36pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/29/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/29/2016SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 0. Record Vote Number: 154.
11/29/2016SenateS.Amdt.5110 Amendment SA 5110 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
11/29/2016SenateS.Amdt.5110 Amendment SA 5110 proposed by Senator Daines for Senator Alexander. (consideration: CR S6525-6526; text: CR S6525-6526) In the nature of a substitute.
11/29/2016SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6525-6526)
11/29/2016SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/28/2016SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Cosponsors (16)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions04/28/2016 Referred to
11/29/2016 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce11/29/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2873. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-270 (12/14/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on November 29, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Expanding Capacity for Health Outcomes Act or the ECHO Act

(Sec. 3) This bill requires the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to report on technology-enabled collaborative learning and capacity building models, which connect specialists to primary care providers through videoconferencing to facilitate case-based learning, dissemination of best practices, and evaluation of outcomes.

The report must include: (1) an analysis of the use, integration, and impact of such models; (2) a list of such models recently funded by HHS; (3) recommendations to reduce barriers to adoption of such models; (4) opportunities for adoption of such models into HHS programs; and (5) recommendations regarding the role of such models in continuing medical education.