There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Trickett Wendler Right to Try Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the use of unapproved medical products by patients diagnosed with a terminal illness in accordance with State law, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/10/2016Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
09/22/2016Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held.
05/10/2016Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/18/2016
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 05/18/2016
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/18/2016
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/18/2016
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 05/18/2016
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/18/2016
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/18/2016
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/18/2016
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 05/19/2016
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/19/2016
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/19/2016
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/19/2016
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/19/2016
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 05/19/2016
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 05/19/2016
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 05/19/2016
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/23/2016
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/07/2016
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/08/2016
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/08/2016
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/09/2016
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/09/2016
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 06/14/2016
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 06/16/2016
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/06/2016
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/07/2016
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 07/13/2016
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/14/2016
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 07/14/2016
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 07/14/2016
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/14/2016
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/14/2016
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 07/14/2016
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 07/14/2016
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/14/2016
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/14/2016
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 07/14/2016
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/14/2016
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 09/06/2016
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 09/21/2016
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 09/22/2016
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 09/26/2016
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 11/15/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions05/10/2016 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/22/2016 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2912. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/10/2016)

Trickett Wendler Right to Try Act of 2016

This bill bars the federal government from prohibiting or restricting the production, manufacture, distribution, prescribing, or dispensing of an experimental drug, biological product, or device that is: (1) intended to treat a patient who has been diagnosed with a terminal illness; and (2) authorized by, and in accordance with, state law. The federal government may not restrict the possession or use of such a treatment by a patient certified by a physician as having exhausted all other treatment options.

A producer, manufacturer, distributor, prescriber, dispenser, possessor, or user of such a treatment has no liability regarding the treatment.

The outcome of production, manufacture, distribution, prescribing, dispensing, possession, or use of such a treatment may not be used by a federal agency to adversely impact review or approval of the treatment.

The treatment must: (1) have successfully completed a phase 1 (initial, small scale) clinical trial; (2) remain under investigation in a clinical trial approved by the Food and Drug Administration (FDA); and (3) not be approved, licensed, or cleared for sale under the Federal Food, Drug, or Cosmetic Act or the Public Health Service Act.

Not later than 30 days after enactment of this bill, and every 30 days thereafter until implementation is complete, the FDA must report on its progress in implementing a streamlined application process for compassionate use of experimental drugs and biological products.