There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

IHS Accountability Act of 2016
Indian Health Service Accountability Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to promote patient-centered care and accountability at the Indian Health Service, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/19/2016Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date
09/21/2016Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Indian Affairs
06/17/2016Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held in Rapid City, South Dakota. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 114-522.
Action By: Committee on Indian Affairs
05/19/2016Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 05/19/2016
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 05/24/2016
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/19/2016
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 09/21/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs05/19/2016 Referred to
06/17/2016 Hearings by
09/21/2016 Markup by

No related bill information was received for S.2953.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2953. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/19/2016)

Indian Health Service Accountability Act of 2016 or the IHS Accountability Act of 2016

This bill amends the Indian Health Care Improvement Act, the Public Health Service Act, and other laws to:

  • allow the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to remove, transfer, or demote certain employees of the Indian Health Service (IHS) based on performance or misconduct;
  • allow HHS to establish certain incentives related to IHS employee recruitment and retention;
  • require HHS to modify the pay system for certain IHS employees;
  • establish requirements for IHS and its employees with respect to retaliation and other conduct; and
  • revise other provisions regarding IHS hiring practices, liability protections, accountability, and transparency.