There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to ensure funding for the National Human Trafficking Hotline, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/14/2016Became Public Law No: 114-271. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2016Signed by President.
12/12/2016Presented to President.
12/08/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H7412)
11/28/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S6518-6519)
11/28/2016Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6518-6519)
05/23/2016Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
12/14/2016Became Public Law No: 114-271. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2016Signed by President.
12/12/2016SenatePresented to President.
12/08/2016-10:52amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/08/2016-10:52amHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7412)
12/08/2016-10:52amHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7412)
12/08/2016-10:52amHouseMr. Goodlatte asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
11/29/2016-4:37pmHouseHeld at the desk.
11/29/2016-2:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/29/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/28/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6518-6519)
11/28/2016SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6518-6519)
05/23/2016SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/23/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions05/23/2016 Referred to
11/28/2016 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2974. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-271 (12/14/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate passed version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) This bill amends the Victims of Trafficking and Violence Protection Act of 2000 to eliminate the provision that specifies that Department of Health and Human Services national human trafficking hotline grants be funded by amounts made available to the Department of Justice for trafficking victim services grants.