There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Freedom to Travel to Cuba Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to allow travel between the United States and Cuba.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/29/2015 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
01/29/2015 Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/29/2015
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/29/2015
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 01/29/2015
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/29/2015
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 01/29/2015
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 01/29/2015
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 01/29/2015
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 01/29/2015
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/05/2015
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/05/2015
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/05/2015
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/09/2015
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/10/2015
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 02/11/2015
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 02/25/2015
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 03/04/2015
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/12/2015
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/12/2015
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/18/2015
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 04/13/2015
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/13/2015
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 04/15/2015
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 04/21/2015
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 04/21/2015
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 04/23/2015
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 04/23/2015
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/23/2015
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 04/23/2015
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/28/2015
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 04/30/2015
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 05/12/2015
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/12/2015
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/14/2015
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/14/2015
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/19/2015
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 05/19/2015
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 06/04/2015
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/11/2015
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/11/2015
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/18/2015
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/18/2015
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/18/2015
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/22/2015
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/22/2015
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 07/22/2015
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 11/10/2015
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 04/28/2016
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/28/2016
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 05/24/2016
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 05/25/2016
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 06/07/2016
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 12/06/2016
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 12/07/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations01/29/2015 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (5)

  • Caribbean area
  • Cuba
  • Latin America
  • Travel and tourism

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.299. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/29/2015)

Freedom to Travel to Cuba Act of 2015

This bill states that:

  • the President may not prohibit or otherwise regulate travel to or from Cuba by U.S. citizens or legal residents, or any of the transactions incident to such travel, including banking transactions;
  • any regulation in effect on the date of enactment of this Act prohibiting or otherwise regulating such travel or transactions incident to such travel shall cease to have any force or effective; but
  • the prohibitions and requirements of this Act shall not apply if the United States is at war with Cuba, armed hostilities between the two countries are in progress, or there is imminent danger to the public health or the physical safety of U.S. travelers.