There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Boys Town Centennial Commemorative Coin Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Boys Town Centennial Commemorative Coin Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint coins in commemoration of the centennial of Boys Town, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/24/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S1831)
03/24/2015Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1830-1831)
01/29/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber
03/25/2015-12:32pmHouseHeld at the desk.
03/25/2015-12:29pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/25/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/24/2015SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1831)
03/24/2015SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1830-1831)
01/29/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 02/04/2015
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 02/04/2015
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 02/04/2015
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 02/05/2015
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/05/2015
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/05/2015
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/05/2015
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/09/2015
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 02/09/2015
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 02/09/2015
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/09/2015
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/10/2015
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 02/10/2015
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 02/10/2015
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 02/10/2015
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 02/11/2015
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 02/11/2015
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 02/11/2015
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/11/2015
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 02/11/2015
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 02/11/2015
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/12/2015
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 02/12/2015
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/12/2015
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/12/2015
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 02/12/2015
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 02/12/2015
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 02/12/2015
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 02/12/2015
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 02/27/2015
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/03/2015
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 03/03/2015
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 03/03/2015
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/11/2015
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 03/11/2015
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/12/2015
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 03/12/2015
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 03/12/2015
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 03/12/2015
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 03/12/2015
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/16/2015
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/16/2015
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/16/2015
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 03/16/2015
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/16/2015
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 03/16/2015
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/16/2015
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/16/2015
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/17/2015
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/17/2015
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/17/2015
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 03/17/2015
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 03/17/2015
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/17/2015
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 03/17/2015
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/17/2015
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 03/17/2015
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 03/17/2015
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/17/2015
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/18/2015
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 03/18/2015
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/18/2015
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/18/2015
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/18/2015
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 03/18/2015
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 03/18/2015
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/19/2015
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 03/19/2015
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/19/2015
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/19/2015
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/19/2015
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/19/2015
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/23/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs01/29/2015 Referred to
03/24/2015 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.301. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (03/24/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Boys Town Centennial Commemorative Coin Act

Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to mint and issue up to 50,000 $5 gold coins, 350,000 $1 silver coins, and 300,000 half-dollar clad coins to commemorate the centennial of the founding of Father Flanagan's Boys Town.

Requires the design of the coins to be emblematic of the 100 years of Boys Town, one of the largest nonprofit child care agencies in the United States.

Permits issuance of such coins only between January 1, 2017, and December 31, 2017.

Subjects all coin sales to specified surcharges, which shall be paid to Boys Town to carry out its cause of caring for and assisting children and families in underserved communities across America.

Directs the Secretary to ensure that: (1) minting and issuing such coins will not result in any net cost to the federal government; and (2) no funds, including surcharges, will be disbursed to Boys Town until the total cost of designing and issuing all authorized coins is recovered by the Treasury.