There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Small Business Cyber Security Improvements Act of 2016

Short Titles as Introduced

Small Business Cyber Security Improvements Act of 2016

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve cyber security for small businesses.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/20/2016By Senator Vitter from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-423.
06/09/2016Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Vitter without amendment. Without written report.
06/06/2016Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
12/20/2016By Senator Vitter from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-423.
Action By: Senate
06/09/2016Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 511.
Action By: Senate
06/09/2016Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Vitter without amendment. Without written report.
06/08/2016Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/06/2016Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 06/06/2016
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/09/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship06/06/2016 Referred to
06/08/2016 Markup by
06/09/2016 Reported by S. Rept. 114-423

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.3024. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (06/09/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Small Business Cyber Security Improvements Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Small Business Act to authorize the Small Business Administration (SBA) to make grants to small business development centers (SBDCs) in furtherance of a Small Business Development Center Cyber Strategy to be developed by the SBA and the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) after the Government Accountability Office (GAO) submits a report that reviews the cybersecurity resources of federal agencies aimed at assisting small businesses.

SBDCs shall provide access to external cyber security specialists to counsel small businesses.

(Sec. 3) DHS and other federal agencies coordinating with DHS may assist SBDCs, through the dissemination of cyber security risk information and other homeland security information, to help small businesses in developing such cyber security infrastructure, threat awareness, and employee training programs.

(Sec. 4) The GAO's cyber resources report must include: (1) an accounting, description, and assessment of the utilization of federal agency programs that provide cybersecurity assistance to small businesses; and (2) an assessment of whether the resources are duplicative of other programs or accessible to small businesses.

The SBA and DHS must include in their SBDC cyber strategy:

  • plans for incorporating SBDCs into cyber programs to assist small businesses;
  • counsel and assistance to improve small businesses' cyber security infrastructure, threat awareness, and training programs for employees, including agreements with Information Sharing and Analysis Centers to gain awareness of actionable threat information that may be beneficial to small businesses; and
  • an analysis of how SBDCs can leverage federal agency programs and develop partnerships to improve cyber support services to small businesses.

The SBA's and DHS's strategy must be developed in consultation with entities representing SBDC concerns and submitted to Congress.