There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Internet Freedom Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to prohibit the National Telecommunications and Information Administration from allowing the Internet Assigned Numbers Authority functions contract to lapse unless specifically authorized to do so by an Act of Congress.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/08/2016Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
06/08/2016Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (10)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 06/08/2016
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK]* 06/08/2016
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 06/15/2016
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 06/22/2016
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/07/2016
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/07/2016
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 09/28/2016
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/28/2016
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 09/29/2016
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 11/16/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation06/08/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3034. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/08/2016)

Protecting Internet Freedom Act

This bill prohibits the Assistant Secretary of Commerce for Communications and Information from allowing the National Telecommunications and Information Administration's responsibility for Internet domain name system functions, including the authoritative root zone file and the performance of the Internet Assigned Numbers Authority functions, to cease unless a federal statute enacted after enactment of this bill expressly grants the Assistant Secretary such authority.

The Assistant Secretary must certify to Congress that the U.S. government has: (1) secured sole ownership of the .gov and .mil top-level domains, and (2) entered into a contract with the Internet Corporation for Assigned Names and Numbers that provides the U.S. government with exclusive control and use of those domains in perpetuity.