There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Conscience Protection Act of 2016

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Motor Vehicle Safety Whistleblower Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Motor Vehicle Safety Whistleblower Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Motor Vehicle Safety Whistleblower Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve motor vehicle safety by encouraging the sharing of certain information.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
07/13/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 245 - 182 (Roll no. 443).(text: CR H4844-4845)
04/28/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2487-2488; text as passed Senate: CR S2487-2488)
04/13/2015Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-13.
01/29/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/14/2016SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
07/13/2016-5:48pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/13/2016-5:48pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 245 - 182 (Roll no. 443). (text: CR H4844-4845)
07/13/2016-5:42pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 182 - 244 (Roll no. 442).
07/13/2016-5:36pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4866)
07/13/2016-4:14pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the motion, and by voice vote, announced that the nays had prevailed. Ms. Wasserman Shultz demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion until a time to be announced.
07/13/2016-4:06pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions, pending the reservation of a point of order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add a section to the bill prohibiting the provisions of section 3 from applying to the extent that such provisions would reduce access to health care services to prevent, prepare for, or respond to the Zika virus. The reservation was subsequently withdrawn.
07/13/2016-4:06pmHouseMs. Wasserman Schultz moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Energy and Commerce. (consideration: CR H4859; text: CR H4859)
07/13/2016-4:06pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
07/13/2016-2:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S. 304.
07/13/2016-2:45pmHousePrevious question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Provides for consideration of the Senate amendment to the House amendment to S. 764. The resolution makes in order a motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment to the House amendment to S. 764.
07/13/2016-2:45pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 822. (consideration: CR H4844-4860)
07/13/2016-2:45pmHouseORDER OF PROCEDURE - Mrs. Blackburn asked unanimous consent that the question of adopting a motion to recommit on S. 304 may be subject to postponement as though under clause 8 of rule 20. Agreed to without objection.
07/13/2016-2:44pmHouseRule H. Res. 822 passed House.
07/12/2016-11:40pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 822 Reported to House. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Provides for consideration of the Senate amendment to the House amendment to S. 764. The resolution makes in order a motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment to the House amendment to S. 764.
05/01/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/29/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
04/29/2015-12:42pmHouseReceived in the House.
04/29/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/28/2015SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2487-2488; text as passed Senate: CR S2487-2488)
04/13/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 36.
04/13/2015SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-13.
02/26/2015SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
01/29/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S655-656)

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 01/29/2015
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 01/29/2015
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 01/29/2015
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 01/29/2015
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 01/29/2015
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/29/2015
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 01/29/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation01/29/2015 Referred to
02/26/2015 Markup by
04/13/2015 Reported by S. Rept. 114-13
House Energy and Commerce04/29/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade05/01/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.304. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/13/2016)

Conscience Protection Act of 2016

(Sec. 3) This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to codify the prohibition against the federal government and state and local governments that receive federal financial assistance for health-related activities penalizing or discriminating against a health care provider based on the provider's refusal to be involved in, or provide coverage for, abortion. Health care providers include health care professionals, health care facilities, social services providers, health care professional training programs, and health insurers.

The Office for Civil Rights of the Department of Health and Human Services, in coordination with the Department of Justice (DOJ), must investigate complaints alleging discrimination based on an individual's religious belief, moral conviction, or refusal to be involved in an abortion.

DOJ or any entity adversely affected by such discrimination may obtain equitable or legal relief in a civil action. Administrative remedies do not need to be sought or exhausted prior to commencing an action or granting relief. Such an action may be brought against a governmental entity.